ID S1287 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Session Law Chapter 349 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

COVENANTS NOT TO COMPETE -- Amends existing law to provide applicability and to remove a provision regarding rebuttable presumptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide applicability and to remove a provision regarding rebuttable presumptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateSession Law Chapter 349 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-22SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-21HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-21SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-20SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-20Houseto Senate
2018-03-20HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-20HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 54-14-2
2018-03-19HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-03-16HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 19, 2018
2018-03-15HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-14HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-06HouseBill Previously Held at Desk, Referred to Business
2018-03-06HouseRead First Time, Held at Desk
2018-03-06HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-03-05Senateto House
2018-03-05SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-05SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 29-5-1
2018-03-01SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2018-02-28SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2018-02-28SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2018-02-28SenateAmendments reported printed
2018-02-28SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2018-02-28SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2018-02-28SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2018-02-23SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2018-02-12SenateReported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2018-02-09SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback