ID S1285 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- Adds to existing law to provide for training for members of school boards and persons interested in serving on school boards.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for training for members of school boards and persons interested in serving on school boards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-03-17 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-03-13 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-12 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2020-02-20 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | to House |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 27-8-0 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |