ID S1283 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR VEHICLES -- Repeals and adds to existing law to prohibit persons from operating a motor vehicle while using a mobile electronic device.
Title
Repeals and adds to existing law to prohibit persons from operating a motor vehicle while using a mobile electronic device.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- FAILED 13-22-0 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Transportation |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |