ID S1277 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SEX CRIMES - Repeals, amends and adds to existing law to prohibit sexual battery of an adult and to provide a punishment for sexual battery of an adult; to revise terminology in the definition of "rape" to make it gender neutral, to provide a circumstance where rape can occur and to provide that both males and females are capable of committing rape; and to provide that the Sexual Offender Registration Notification and Community Right-to-Know Act shall apply to certain persons who commit sexual battery of an adult.
Title
Repeals, amends and adds to existing law to prohibit sexual battery of an adult and to provide a punishment for sexual battery of an adult; to revise terminology in the definition of "rape" to make it gender neutral, to provide a circumstance where rape can occur and to provide that both males and females are capable of committing rape; and to provide that the Sexual Offender Registration Notification and Community Right-to-Know Act shall apply to certain persons who commit sexual battery of an adult.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration |
2016-02-29 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-02-26 | Senate | to House |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-02-26 | Senate | PASSED -- 20-15-0 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |