ID S1272 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Signed by Governor on 03/18/14 Session Law Chapter 123 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Signed by Governor on 03/18/14 Session Law Chapter 123 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to provide that the Legislative Council shall meet at least two times a year or as may be necessary, to provide that members of the council shall hold office for two years and to establish provisions relating to filling vacancies; to revise provisions relating to officers of the council and to provide that the council may adopt its own rules and appoint certain committees.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that the Legislative Council shall meet at least two times a year or as may be necessary, to provide that members of the council shall hold office for two years and to establish provisions relating to filling vacancies; to revise provisions relating to officers of the council and to provide that the council may adopt its own rules and appoint certain committees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/18/14 Session Law Chapter 123 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/14/14 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2014-03-13 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2014-03-11 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-11 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-11 | House | PASSED -- 64-0-6 |
2014-03-11 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-03-10 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2014-03-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-06 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-03 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2014-03-03 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-02-28 | Senate | to House |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-02-28 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-1 |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |