ID S1271 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 256 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 256 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law relating to the Department of Lands to require applicants for state grazing leases to submit grazing management proposals, to provide requirements for such proposals and to provide for certain exceptions.
Title
Adds to existing law relating to the Department of Lands to require applicants for state grazing leases to submit grazing management proposals, to provide requirements for such proposals and to provide for certain exceptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 256 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-26 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/26 | |
2012-03-26 | To Governor | |
2012-03-23 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-22 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-22 | To enrol | |
2012-03-21 | to Senate | |
2012-03-21 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-21 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 61-0-9 | |
2012-03-19 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-19 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-16 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-16 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-16 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-09 | to Res/Con | |
2012-03-09 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-09 | House intro | |
2012-03-08 | to House | |
2012-03-08 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-08 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 31-0-4 | |
2012-03-07 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-07 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-06 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-06 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-06 | Rpt out | |
2012-01-31 | to Res/Env | |
2012-01-31 | Rpt prt | |
2012-01-30 | to printing | |
2012-01-30 | 1st rdg | |
2012-01-30 | Senate intro |