ID S1270 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 255 Effective: 04/03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 255 Effective: 04/03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and repeals existing law relating to legislative appointments to the Pacific States Agreement on Radioactive Materials Transportation Management, the Grant Evaluation Committee of the State Trust Fund for Outdoor Recreation Enhancement and the Idaho Hall of Fame Advisory Board; providing legislative intent that no legislative appointment be made for the purpose of Idaho Commemorative Silver Medallions until the State Treasurer issues a new series of medallions; and to revise the name of the Multistate Highway Transportation Agreement.
Title
Amends and repeals existing law relating to legislative appointments to the Pacific States Agreement on Radioactive Materials Transportation Management, the Grant Evaluation Committee of the State Trust Fund for Outdoor Recreation Enhancement and the Idaho Hall of Fame Advisory Board; providing legislative intent that no legislative appointment be made for the purpose of Idaho Commemorative Silver Medallions until the State Treasurer issues a new series of medallions; and to revise the name of the Multistate Highway Transportation Agreement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 255 Effective: 04/03/12 | |
2012-03-27 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/26 | |
2012-03-26 | To Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-23 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-23 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-22 | To enrol | |
2012-03-22 | to Senate | |
2012-03-22 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-22 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 70-0-0 | |
2012-03-21 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-21 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-20 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-20 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-20 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-08 | to St Aff | |
2012-02-08 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-08 | House intro | |
2012-02-07 | to House | |
2012-02-07 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-07 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2012-02-06 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-06 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-03 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-03 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-03 | Rpt out | |
2012-01-30 | to St Aff | |
2012-01-30 | Rpt prt | |
2012-01-27 | to printing | |
2012-01-27 | 1st rdg | |
2012-01-27 | Senate intro |