ID S1265 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 83 Effective: 01/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 83 Effective: 01/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to executions to revise provisions relating to the return of a death warrant.
Title
Amends existing law relating to executions to revise provisions relating to the return of a death warrant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 83 Effective: 01/01/12 | |
2012-03-16 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/15 | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor | |
2012-03-15 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-14 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-14 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-13 | To enrol | |
2012-03-12 | to Senate | |
2012-03-12 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-12 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 63-0-7 | |
2012-02-17 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-17 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-16 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-16 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-16 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-14 | to Jud | |
2012-02-14 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-14 | House intro | |
2012-02-13 | to House | |
2012-02-13 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-13 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2012-02-08 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-08 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-07 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-07 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-07 | Rpt out | |
2012-01-27 | to Jud | |
2012-01-27 | Rpt prt | |
2012-01-26 | to printing | |
2012-01-26 | 1st rdg | |
2012-01-26 | Senate intro |