ID S1262 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-25 - Session Law Chapter 11 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-25 - Session Law Chapter 11 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE DISASTER PREPAREDNESS ACT -- Amends existing law to provide for certain limitations on firearms regulation during a state of disaster emergency.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for certain limitations on firearms regulation during a state of disaster emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-25 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 11 Effective: 07/01/2022 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2022-02-24 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2022-02-23 | House | to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | Title apvd |
2022-02-23 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 58-9-3 |
2022-02-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-18 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-02-11 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2022-02-11 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | to House |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 30-5-0 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |