ID S1254 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 27 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 27 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to the Idaho State Bar to revise a definition.
Title
Amends existing law relating to the Idaho State Bar to revise a definition.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 27 Effective: 07/01/10 | |
2010-02-26 | To Governor | |
2010-02-25 | Sp signed | |
2010-02-24 | Pres signed | |
2010-02-24 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-02-23 | To enrol | |
2010-02-22 | to Senate | |
2010-02-22 | Title apvd | |
2010-02-22 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 65-1-4 | |
2010-02-17 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-02-17 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-16 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-16 | rec d/p | |
2010-02-16 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-08 | to Jud | |
2010-02-08 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-08 | House intro | |
2010-02-05 | to House | |
2010-02-05 | Title apvd | |
2010-02-05 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2010-01-29 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-01-29 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-01-28 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-01-28 | rec d/p | |
2010-01-28 | Rpt out | |
2010-01-19 | to Jud | |
2010-01-19 | Rpt prt | |
2010-01-18 | to printing | |
2010-01-18 | 1st rdg | |
2010-01-18 | Senate intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1254.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1254.pdf |