ID S1237 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Session Law Chapter 49 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Session Law Chapter 49 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
VETERANS -- Amends existing law to authorize the Division of Human Resources to issue certain rules.
Title
Amends existing law to authorize the Division of Human Resources to issue certain rules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 49 Effective: 07/01/2022 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2022-03-11 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2022-03-09 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-09 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2 |
2022-03-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-03-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-02-18 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2022-02-18 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2022-02-17 | Senate | to House |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |