ID S1230 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-15 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-15 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HIGHWAY DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNT - Amends existing law to revise apportionment regarding the Highway Distribution Account and to remove provisions regarding apportionment to the law enforcement account.
Title
Amends existing law to revise apportionment regarding the Highway Distribution Account and to remove provisions regarding apportionment to the law enforcement account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 8 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-15 | Senate | Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate |
2016-02-15 | Senate | FAILED -- 8-27-0 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Transportation |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |