ID S1213 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Signed by Governor on 02/25/16 Session Law Chapter 26 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FISH AND GAME - Amends existing law to prohibit the use of unmanned aircraft systems for hunting, molesting or locating game animals, game birds and furbearing animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to prohibit the use of unmanned aircraft systems for hunting, molesting or locating game animals, game birds and furbearing animals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-25SenateSigned by Governor on 02/25/16 Session Law Chapter 26 Effective: 07/01/2016
2016-02-22SenateReported delivered to Governor at 11:40 a.m. on 02/19/16
2016-02-19SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2016-02-18HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2016-02-17SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2016-02-16SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2016-02-15Houseto Senate
2016-02-15HouseTitle apvd
2016-02-15HousePASSED -- 68-1-1
2016-02-15HouseRead Third Time in Full
2016-02-11HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2016-02-10HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2016-02-05HouseRead First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
2016-02-05HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2016-02-04Senateto House
2016-02-04SenateTitle apvd
2016-02-04SenatePASSED -- 31-0-4
2016-02-04SenateRead third time in full
2016-02-03SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2016-02-02SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2016-01-27SenateReported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment
2016-01-26SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback