ID S1207 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Session Law Chapter 312 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Session Law Chapter 312 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- SUPREME COURT -- Relates to the appropriation to the Supreme Court for fiscal year 2020.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Supreme Court for fiscal year 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 312 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2019-04-03 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2019-04-01 | House | to Senate |
2019-04-01 | House | Title apvd |
2019-04-01 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 49-20-1 |
2019-03-29 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |