ID S1207 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Signed by Governor on 02/25/16 Session Law Chapter 24 Effective: 02/25/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Signed by Governor on 02/25/16 Session Law Chapter 24 Effective: 02/25/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS - DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND WELFARE - PSYCHIATRIC HOSPITALIZATION - Appropriates an additional $511,600 for State Hospital South for fiscal year 2016.
Title
Appropriates an additional $511,600 for State Hospital South for fiscal year 2016.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 02/25/16 Session Law Chapter 24 Effective: 02/25/2016 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor at 11:40 a.m. on 02/19/16 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2016-02-18 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2016-02-15 | House | to Senate |
2016-02-15 | House | Title apvd |
2016-02-15 | House | PASSED -- 63-5-2 |
2016-02-15 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-02-12 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 15, 2016 |
2016-02-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-10 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-05 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 8, 2016 |
2016-02-04 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-03 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-02 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-01 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-02-01 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-01-29 | Senate | to House |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-01-29 | Senate | PASSED -- 32-0-3 |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |