ID S1205 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Session Law Chapter 329 Effective: Retroactive to 01/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FIREARMS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the prohibition of regulation of certain firearms and to prohibit certain regulation of firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the prohibition of regulation of certain firearms and to prohibit certain regulation of firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10SenateSession Law Chapter 329 Effective: Retroactive to 01/20/2021
2021-05-04SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2021-05-04HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2021-05-04SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2021-05-04SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2021-05-03Houseto Senate
2021-05-03HouseTitle apvd
2021-05-03HousePreviously Read in Full -- PASSED 55-11-3
2021-05-03HouseRead Third Time in Full
2021-04-29HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, May 3, 2021
2021-04-27HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-04-26HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-04-21HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2021-04-21HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2021-04-20Senateto House
2021-04-20SenateTitle apvd
2021-04-20SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 28-7-0
2021-04-20SenateRead in full as required)
2021-04-20SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2021-04-20SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2021-04-19SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2021-04-19SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2021-04-14SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback