ID S1202 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Session Law Chapter 303 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Session Law Chapter 303 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
GARNISHMENTS -- Repeals, amends and adds to existing law to revise the process for garnishment.
Title
Repeals, amends and adds to existing law to revise the process for garnishment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 303 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-03-28 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-03-27 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-27 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-27 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2017-03-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2017-03-22 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |