ID S1201 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Session Law Chapter 308 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Session Law Chapter 308 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TRANSPORTATION -- Amends existing law to phase out the distribution of funds from the Highway Distribution Account to the Law Enforcement Account, and reallocating those funds to local units of government and the State Highway Account for transportation.
Title
Amends existing law to phase out the distribution of funds from the Highway Distribution Account to the Law Enforcement Account, and reallocating those funds to local units of government and the State Highway Account for transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 308 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2019-04-03 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2019-04-01 | House | to Senate |
2019-04-01 | House | Title apvd |
2019-04-01 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 56-13-1 |
2019-03-29 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 1, 2019 |
2019-03-28 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-21 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2019-03-21 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 19-15-1 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Transportation |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |