ID S1201 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Signed by Governor on 03/30/16 Session Law Chapter 275 Effective: 03/30/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Signed by Governor on 03/30/16 Session Law Chapter 275 Effective: 03/30/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS - CATASTROPHIC HEALTH CARE PROGRAM - Appropriates and transfers $28,892,700 from the Catastrophic Health Care Cost Fund to the General Fund for fiscal year 2016.
Title
Appropriates and transfers $28,892,700 from the Catastrophic Health Care Cost Fund to the General Fund for fiscal year 2016.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/30/16 Session Law Chapter 275 Effective: 03/30/2016 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on 03/28/16 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2016-03-25 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2016-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-24 | House | PASSED -- 65-0-5 |
2016-03-24 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-03-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-17 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-16 | House | U.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-15 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 14, 2016 |
2016-03-10 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-04 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 7, 2016 |
2016-03-03 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-02 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-01 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-29 | House | U.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 29, 2016 |
2016-02-25 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-19 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 22, 2016 |
2016-02-18 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-17 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-16 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-15 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-15 | House | U.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-12 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 15, 2016 |
2016-02-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-10 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-05 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 8, 2016 |
2016-02-04 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-03 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-02 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-01 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-01-29 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 1, 2016 |
2016-01-29 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-01-28 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-01-28 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-01-27 | Senate | to House |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-01-27 | Senate | PASSED -- 33-0-2 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |