ID S1200 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Session Law Chapter 304 Effective: 05/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Session Law Chapter 304 Effective: 05/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
IDAHO WRONGFUL CONVICTION ACT -- Amends Senate Bill 1027 to revise provisions regarding compensation related to a wrongful conviction.
Title
Amends Senate Bill 1027 to revise provisions regarding compensation related to a wrongful conviction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 304 Effective: 05/05/2021 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2021-05-04 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2021-05-03 | Senate | to enrol |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the House -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the House, filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the House, filed for Second Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; referred to engrossment |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Referred to 10th Order for possible concurrence |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Returned from House, amended |
2021-04-26 | House | to Senate |
2021-04-26 | House | Title apvd |
2021-04-26 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3 |
2021-04-26 | House | Read third time in full as amended in House |
2021-04-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 26, 2021 |
2021-04-22 | House | Read second time as amended in House; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-21 | House | Read first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading |
2021-04-20 | House | Filed for First Reading |
2021-04-20 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2021-04-14 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2021-04-14 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2021-04-13 | Senate | to House |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |