ID S1195 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
EMPLOYMENT SECURITY LAW -- Amends existing law to revise the average high cost multiple on and after January 1, 2018, and certain income tax rates.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the average high cost multiple on and after January 1, 2018, and certain income tax rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 5 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- FAILED 5-29-1 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the House, filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; referred to engrossment |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to 10th Order for possible concurrence |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned from House, amended |
2017-03-28 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-28 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-28 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2017-03-28 | House | Read first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-28 | House | Filed for First Reading |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2017-03-28 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-23 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2017-03-22 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2017-03-22 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-1-0 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |