ID S1186 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Signed by Governor on 04/10/15 Session Law Chapter 322 Effective: 04/10/2015 Section 10; 07/01/2015 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Signed by Governor on 04/10/15 Session Law Chapter 322 Effective: 04/10/2015 Section 10; 07/01/2015 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS - PUBLIC SCHOOLS - CHILDREN'S PROGRAMS DIVISION - Appropriates $282,074,600 for the Public Schools Educational Support Program/Division of Children's Programs for fiscal year 2016; provides guidance on funds for the Idaho Digital Learning Academy; directs the use of funds for the Safe and Drug-Free Schools program; directs the use of funds for literacy programs and remedial coursework; directs the use of funds for limited English proficiency programs; requiring advanced opportunities reporting; defining the term "distributed"; and transferring $21.5 million from the Consumer Protection Fund to the Public Education Stabilization Fund for fiscal year 2015.
Title
Appropriates $282,074,600 for the Public Schools Educational Support Program/Division of Children's Programs for fiscal year 2016; provides guidance on funds for the Idaho Digital Learning Academy; directs the use of funds for the Safe and Drug-Free Schools program; directs the use of funds for literacy programs and remedial coursework; directs the use of funds for limited English proficiency programs; requiring advanced opportunities reporting; defining the term "distributed"; and transferring $21.5 million from the Consumer Protection Fund to the Public Education Stabilization Fund for fiscal year 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/10/15 Session Law Chapter 322 Effective: 04/10/2015 Section 10; 07/01/2015 All other sections |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 04/09/15 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2015-04-08 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2015-04-06 | House | to Senate |
2015-04-06 | House | Title apvd |
2015-04-06 | House | King |
2015-04-06 | House | 64-5-1 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Nate, Nielsen, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Scott, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Batt, Dayley, McMillan, Moyle Absent -- Bateman Floor Sponsor |
2015-04-06 | House | PASSED |
2015-04-06 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times |
2015-04-06 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-04-02 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-04-02 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2015-04-01 | Senate | to House |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Thayn |
2015-04-01 | Senate | 35-0-0 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Cameron, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2015-04-01 | Senate | PASSED |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |