ID S1183 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 220 Effective: 04/06/11 Section 1; 07/01/11 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 220 Effective: 04/06/11 Section 1; 07/01/11 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates an additional $30,000 to the State Board of Education for the Scholarships and Grants Program for fiscal year 2011; appropriates $10,353,000 to the State Board of Education for Special Programs for fiscal year 2012; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 27.23; and provides legislative intent.
Title
Appropriates an additional $30,000 to the State Board of Education for the Scholarships and Grants Program for fiscal year 2011; appropriates $10,353,000 to the State Board of Education for Special Programs for fiscal year 2012; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 27.23; and provides legislative intent.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 220 Effective: 04/06/11 Section 1; 07/01/11 All other sections | |
2011-04-05 | Delivered to Governor on 04/05 | |
2011-04-05 | To Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-04 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-04 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-01 | To enrol | |
2011-03-31 | to Senate | |
2011-03-31 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-31 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 63-4-3 | |
2011-03-28 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-28 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-25 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-25 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-25 | House intro | |
2011-03-24 | to House | |
2011-03-24 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-24 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2011-03-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-22 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-22 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-21 | to Fin | |
2011-03-21 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-18 | to printing | |
2011-03-18 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-18 | Senate intro |