ID S1174 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR -- Relates to the appropriation to the Office of the Lieutenant Governor for fiscal year 2022.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Office of the Lieutenant Governor for fiscal year 2022.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |