ID S1168 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Session Law Chapter 275 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

ELECTIONS -- Adds to existing law to prohibit the use of private moneys for the administration of elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to prohibit the use of private moneys for the administration of elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenateSession Law Chapter 275 Effective: 07/01/2021
2021-04-21SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2021-04-21HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2021-04-20SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2021-04-19SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2021-04-19Houseto Senate
2021-04-19HouseTitle apvd
2021-04-19HousePreviously Read in Full -- PASSED 64-3-3
2021-04-19HouseRead Third Time in Full
2021-04-16HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 19, 2021
2021-04-15HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-04-14HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-04-06HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2021-04-06HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2021-03-18Senateto House
2021-03-18SenateTitle apvd
2021-03-18SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 28-7-0
2021-03-17SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2021-03-16SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2021-03-16SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2021-03-16SenateAmendments reported printed
2021-03-16SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2021-03-16SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2021-03-16SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2021-03-15SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2021-03-08SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2021-03-05SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback