ID S1168 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-29 - Signed by Governor on 03/29/13 Session Law Chapter 203 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-29 - Signed by Governor on 03/29/13 Session Law Chapter 203 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $7,935,200 to Idaho Public Television for fiscal year 2014; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 59; and provides guidance for employee compensation.
Title
Appropriates $7,935,200 to Idaho Public Television for fiscal year 2014; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 59; and provides guidance for employee compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/29/13 Session Law Chapter 203 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/27/13 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2013-03-27 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2013-03-25 | House | to Senate |
2013-03-25 | House | Title apvd |
2013-03-25 | House | PASSED -- 44-20-6 |
2013-03-25 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-03-22 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-21 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-21 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-20 | Senate | PASSED -- 29-5-1 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |