ID S1157 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-01 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 154 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-01 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 154 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $13,903,200 to the State Controller for fiscal year 2012; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 96; provides for the recovery of services costs; reappropriates certain fund balances; and exempts certain appropriation transfer limits.
Title
Appropriates $13,903,200 to the State Controller for fiscal year 2012; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 96; provides for the recovery of services costs; reappropriates certain fund balances; and exempts certain appropriation transfer limits.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 154 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-03-30 | Delivered to Governor on 03/29 | |
2011-03-29 | To Governor | |
2011-03-28 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-25 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-25 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-24 | To enrol | |
2011-03-23 | to Senate | |
2011-03-23 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-23 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 65-2-3 | |
2011-03-18 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-18 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-17 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-17 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-17 | House intro | |
2011-03-16 | to House | |
2011-03-16 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-16 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2011-03-15 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-15 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-14 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-14 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-14 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-11 | to Fin | |
2011-03-11 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-10 | to printing | |
2011-03-10 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-10 | Senate intro |