ID S1149 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 310 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 310 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to and amends existing law relating to education to provide provisions relating to unanticipated public charter school closure and to provide for certain funding and to provide for application of laws.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law relating to education to provide provisions relating to unanticipated public charter school closure and to provide for certain funding and to provide for application of laws.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 310 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-04-07 | Delivered to Governor on 04/08 | |
2011-04-07 | To Governor | |
2011-04-07 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-06 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-06 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-05 | To enrol | |
2011-04-05 | to Senate | |
2011-04-05 | Title apvd | |
2011-04-05 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 66-0-4 | |
2011-03-30 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-30 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-29 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-29 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-29 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-23 | to Educ | |
2011-03-23 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-23 | House intro | |
2011-03-22 | to House | |
2011-03-22 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-22 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 32-1-2 | |
2011-03-17 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-17 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-16 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-16 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-16 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-09 | to Educ | |
2011-03-09 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-08 | to printing | |
2011-03-08 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-08 | Senate intro |