ID S1148 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Session Law Chapter 107 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- BOARD OF TAX APPEALS -- Relates to the appropriation to the Board of Tax Appeals for fiscal year 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the appropriation to the Board of Tax Appeals for fiscal year 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateSession Law Chapter 107 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-18SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-03-15HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-14SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-14SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-13Houseto Senate
2019-03-13HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-13HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2
2019-03-12HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-11HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-11HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-08Senateto House
2019-03-08SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-08SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-03-06SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-05SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-04SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2019-03-01SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback