ID S1146 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-10 - Vetoed by the Governor on 04/16/15
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-10 - Vetoed by the Governor on 04/16/15
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
CONTROLLED SUBSTANCES - Amends existing law to define "cannabidiol oil" and to authorize its use in limited circumstances.
Title
Amends existing law to define "cannabidiol oil" and to authorize its use in limited circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor on 04/16/15 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 04/09/15 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2015-04-08 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2015-04-06 | House | to Senate |
2015-04-06 | House | Title apvd |
2015-04-06 | House | Loertscher |
2015-04-06 | House | 39-30-1 AYES -- Andrus, Barbieri, Beyeler, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Collins, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Jordan, King, Kloc, Loertscher, McCrostie, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Nye, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Rubel, Rudolph, Scott, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Troy, Vander Woude, Wintrow, Wood NAYS -- Anderson, Anderst, Batt, Bell, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Clow, Crane, Dayley, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, Kerby, Luker, Malek, McDonald, Monks, Packer, Palmer, Romrell, Rusche, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Wills, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker Absent -- Bateman Floor Sponsor |
2015-04-06 | House | PASSED |
2015-04-06 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times |
2015-04-06 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-04-02 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-25 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2015-03-25 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-24 | Senate | PASSED -- 22-12-1 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |