ID S1139 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Session Law Chapter 278 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Session Law Chapter 278 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH CARE -- Adds to and amends existing law to provide that certain hospitals or facilities shall specify which persons have authority to admit patients.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law to provide that certain hospitals or facilities shall specify which persons have authority to admit patients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 278 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-03-28 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-24 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1 |
2017-03-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-22 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-17 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare |
2017-03-17 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |