ID S1139 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 198 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 198 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to security for compensation to provide correct terminology and to revise provisions relating to certain money and bond requirements for insurers transacting worker's compensation insurance.
Title
Amends existing law relating to security for compensation to provide correct terminology and to revise provisions relating to certain money and bond requirements for insurers transacting worker's compensation insurance.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 198 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-04-04 | Delivered to Governor on 04/01 | |
2011-04-01 | To Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-30 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-30 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-29 | To enrol | |
2011-03-28 | to Senate | |
2011-03-28 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-28 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 69-0-1 | |
2011-03-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-22 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-22 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-14 | to Com/HuRes | |
2011-03-14 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-14 | House intro | |
2011-03-11 | to House | |
2011-03-11 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-11 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2011-03-10 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-10 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-09 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-09 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-09 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-04 | to Com/HuRes | |
2011-03-04 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-03 | to printing | |
2011-03-03 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-03 | Senate intro |