ID S1136 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

MARTIAL LAW -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the authority of the Governor during a state of extreme peril and to provide that the Governor may not alter, adjust, or suspend any provision of Idaho Code in certain instances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the authority of the Governor during a state of extreme peril and to provide that the Governor may not alter, adjust, or suspend any provision of Idaho Code in certain instances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2021-04-12HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2021-04-09SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2021-04-09Senateto enrol
2021-04-09SenateTitle apvd
2021-04-09SenateRead third time as amended in the House -- PASSED 28-7-0
2021-04-09SenateRead in full as required)
2021-04-09SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2021-04-09SenateRead second time as amended in the House, filed for Third Reading
2021-04-08SenateRead first time as amended in the House, filed for Second Reading
2021-04-08SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2021-04-08SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; referred to engrossment
2021-04-08SenateReferred to 10th Order for possible concurrence
2021-04-08SenateReturned from House, amended
2021-04-07Houseto Senate
2021-04-07HouseTitle apvd
2021-04-07HouseRules Suspended:
2021-04-07HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-04-06HouseRead first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading
2021-04-06HouseAmendments reported printed
2021-03-18HouseFiled for First Reading
2021-03-18HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2021-03-18HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2021-03-18HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2021-03-17HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2021-03-15HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2021-03-15HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2021-03-12Senateto House
2021-03-12SenateTitle apvd
2021-03-12SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 27-7-1
2021-03-11SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2021-03-10SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2021-03-10SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2021-03-10SenateAmendments reported printed
2021-03-10SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2021-03-10SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2021-03-10SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2021-02-26SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2021-02-24SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2021-02-23SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback