ID S1135 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Signed by Governor on 04/21/15 Session Law Chapter 339 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Signed by Governor on 04/21/15 Session Law Chapter 339 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
LIENS - Amends existing law to provide that for a claim of lien an owner or reputed owner does not include a trustee of a deed of trust; and to provide that a trustee of a deed of trust shall not be included in a claim of lien, foreclosure or judgment.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that for a claim of lien an owner or reputed owner does not include a trustee of a deed of trust; and to provide that a trustee of a deed of trust shall not be included in a claim of lien, foreclosure or judgment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/21/15 Session Law Chapter 339 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 04/16/15 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2015-04-10 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2015-04-09 | House | to Senate |
2015-04-09 | House | Title apvd |
2015-04-09 | House | PASSED -- 66-1-3 |
2015-04-09 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-04-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-04-07 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-04-06 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-04-02 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 6, 2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-31 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-30 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-24 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration |
2015-03-24 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2015-03-23 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-23 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-1 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |