ID S1123 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Session Law Chapter 220 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Session Law Chapter 220 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COURTS -- Amends existing law to revise the definition of “debt owed to the court” and to remove a provision regarding debts of less than fifty dollars.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the definition of “debt owed to the court” and to remove a provision regarding debts of less than fifty dollars.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 220 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2019-03-21 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2019-03-19 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-19 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-19 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 53-13-4 |
2019-03-18 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-15 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-26 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2019-02-26 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |