ID S1120 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Session Law Chapter 201 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Session Law Chapter 201 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ALCOHOL -- Amends existing law to provide that retail liquor by the drink licenses issued on or after July 1, 2023, may not be sold, leased, or transferred and to provide that retail liquor by the drink licenses issued before July 1, 2023, may be sold or transferred only once.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that retail liquor by the drink licenses issued on or after July 1, 2023, may not be sold, leased, or transferred and to provide that retail liquor by the drink licenses issued before July 1, 2023, may be sold or transferred only once.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 201 Effective: 07/01/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2023-03-28 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2023-03-23 | House | to Senate |
2023-03-23 | House | Title apvd |
2023-03-23 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 42-28-0 |
2023-03-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-03-22 | House | U.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-03-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-03-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-03-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-13 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2023-03-13 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | to House |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 27-8-0 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |