ID S1115 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Session Law Chapter 61 Effective: 03/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Session Law Chapter 61 Effective: 03/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- LEGISLATIVE BRANCH -- Relates to the appropriation to the Legislative Branch for fiscal year 2019.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Legislative Branch for fiscal year 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 61 Effective: 03/07/2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2019-03-06 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2019-03-01 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-01 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 64-0-6 |
2019-02-28 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-02-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-26 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-26 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |