ID S1115 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-01 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 152 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-01 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 152 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and adds to existing law relating to abortion and the insurance contract to provide for legislative findings and purpose, to prohibit abortion coverage by a qualified health plan offered through an exchange created pursuant to the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act within the state of Idaho and to provide exceptions; to revise a requirement relating to a determination that an abortion is necessary in a certain circumstance and to provide a code reference.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law relating to abortion and the insurance contract to provide for legislative findings and purpose, to prohibit abortion coverage by a qualified health plan offered through an exchange created pursuant to the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act within the state of Idaho and to provide exceptions; to revise a requirement relating to a determination that an abortion is necessary in a certain circumstance and to provide a code reference.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 152 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-03-30 | Delivered to Governor on 03/29 | |
2011-03-29 | To Governor | |
2011-03-28 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-25 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-25 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-24 | To enrol | |
2011-03-23 | to Senate | |
2011-03-23 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-23 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 56-13-1 | |
2011-03-16 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-16 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-15 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-15 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-15 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-02 | to St Aff | |
2011-03-02 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-02 | House intro | |
2011-03-01 | to House | |
2011-03-01 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-01 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 27-7-1 | |
2011-02-25 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-25 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-24 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-24 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-24 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-18 | to St Aff | |
2011-02-18 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-17 | to printing | |
2011-02-17 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-17 | Senate intro |