ID S1113 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Session Law Chapter 182 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

IDAHO CRIMINAL JUSTICE SYSTEM -- Amends existing law to revise the composition and compensation of the Commission of Pardons and Parole; to provide that certain meetings by less than a majority of the commission regarding parole violations shall be exempt from the open meetings law; to revise rulemaking authority for the commission; to provide that the commission shall consider certain factors in making any parole or commutation decision and to revise how the commission holds hearings on parole violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise the composition and compensation of the Commission of Pardons and Parole; to provide that certain meetings by less than a majority of the commission regarding parole violations shall be exempt from the open meetings law; to revise rulemaking authority for the commission; to provide that the commission shall consider certain factors in making any parole or commutation decision and to revise how the commission holds hearings on parole violations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27SenateSession Law Chapter 182 Effective: 07/01/2017
2017-03-21SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2017-03-21HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2017-03-20SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2017-03-17SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2017-03-16Houseto Senate
2017-03-16HouseTitle apvd
2017-03-16HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1
2017-03-15HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2017-03-14HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2017-03-08HouseRead First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2017-03-08HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2017-03-07Senateto House
2017-03-07SenateTitle apvd
2017-03-07SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2017-03-01SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2017-02-28SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-02-24SenateReported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
2017-02-23SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback