ID S1086 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ANTI-BOYCOTT AGAINST ISRAEL ACT -- Adds to existing law to prohibit a public entity from entering into certain contracts with companies that boycott Israel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to prohibit a public entity from entering into certain contracts with companies that boycott Israel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-04-14HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-04-13HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-03-03HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2021-03-03HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2021-03-02Senateto House
2021-03-02SenateTitle apvd
2021-03-02SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2021-02-26SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2021-02-25SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2021-02-11SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback