ID S1085 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FETAL HEARTBEAT PREBORN CHILD PROTECTION ACT -- Adds to existing law to prohibit an abortion following detection of a fetal heartbeat.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to prohibit an abortion following detection of a fetal heartbeat.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-02-23SenateRetained on calendar
2021-02-22SenateRetained on calendar
2021-02-16SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2021-02-15SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2021-02-11SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback