ID S1078 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-29 - Signed by Governor on 03/29/13 Session Law Chapter 190 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-29 - Signed by Governor on 03/29/13 Session Law Chapter 190 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law to provide that no state postsecondary educational institution shall take any action or enforce any policy that would deny a religious student group any benefit available to any other student group based on the religious student group's requirement that its leaders adhere to its sincerely held religious beliefs or standards of conduct.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide that no state postsecondary educational institution shall take any action or enforce any policy that would deny a religious student group any benefit available to any other student group based on the religious student group's requirement that its leaders adhere to its sincerely held religious beliefs or standards of conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/29/13 Session Law Chapter 190 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/27/13 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2013-03-26 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2013-03-21 | House | to Senate |
2013-03-21 | House | Title apvd |
2013-03-21 | House | PASSED -- 56-11-3 |
2013-03-21 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-03-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-03-19 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-03-18 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-15 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-11 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2013-03-11 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2013-03-07 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-07 | Senate | PASSED -- 30-5-0 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |