ID S1074 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Session Law Chapter 255 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

COUNTY JAILS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding reception and board of inmates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding reception and board of inmates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateSession Law Chapter 255 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-28SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-03-27HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-26SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-25SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-22Houseto Senate
2019-03-22HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-22HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2
2019-03-21HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-20HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-13HouseRead First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
2019-03-13HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-12Senateto House
2019-03-12SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-12SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-03-08SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2019-03-07SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2019-03-07SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2019-03-07SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-03-07SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2019-03-07SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2019-03-07SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-03-07SenateReferred to 14th Order for amendment
2019-03-05SenateRetained on calendar
2019-03-04SenateRetained on calendar
2019-03-01SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-28SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-11SenateReported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
2019-02-08SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback