ID S1072 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Session Law Chapter Effective:
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding publication fees to prohibit such fees for rule removal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding publication fees to prohibit such fees for rule removal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateSession Law Chapter Effective:
2019-04-11SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-04-11HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-04-10SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-04-10Houseto Senate
2019-04-10HouseTitle apvd
2019-04-10HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 63-0-7
2019-04-09HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-04-08HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-04-05HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 8, 2019
2019-04-04HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-04-03HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-04-02HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-04-01HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-29HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 1, 2019
2019-03-28HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-27HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-26HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-25HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-22HouseU.C. to place at bottom of Senate bills of third reading calendar Monday, March 25, 2019
2019-03-21HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-20HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-19HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-18HouseU.C. to place at bottom of Senate bills of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-15HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 18, 2019
2019-03-14HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-13HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-12HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-11HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-08HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-01HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2019-03-01HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-28Senateto House
2019-02-28SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-28SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-02-27SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-26SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-11SenateReported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
2019-02-08SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback