ID S1068 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- Adds to existing law to provide for certain requirements for pharmacy benefit managers.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for certain requirements for pharmacy benefit managers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare |
2019-03-13 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 32-2-1 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |