ID S1067 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 211 Effective: 07/01/13 Legislative provisions; 07/01/12 Funding provisions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 211 Effective: 07/01/13 Legislative provisions; 07/01/12 Funding provisions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to the Idaho DNA Database Act of 1996 to revise legislative findings and statement of purpose; to revise definitions; to revise requirements relating to offenders subject to DNA sample collection and right thumbprint impression, to remove language enumerating certain crimes; and to revise provisions relating to the responsibility to provide a DNA sample and thumbprint impression.
Title
Amends existing law relating to the Idaho DNA Database Act of 1996 to revise legislative findings and statement of purpose; to revise definitions; to revise requirements relating to offenders subject to DNA sample collection and right thumbprint impression, to remove language enumerating certain crimes; and to revise provisions relating to the responsibility to provide a DNA sample and thumbprint impression.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 211 Effective: 07/01/13 Legislative provisions; 07/01/12 Funding provisions | |
2011-04-01 | Delivered to Governor on 03/31 | |
2011-03-30 | To Governor | |
2011-03-30 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-28 | To enrol | |
2011-03-25 | to Senate | |
2011-03-25 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-25 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 68-0-2 | |
2011-03-22 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-22 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-21 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-21 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-21 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-15 | to Jud | |
2011-03-15 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-15 | House intro | |
2011-03-14 | to House | |
2011-03-14 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-14 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2011-03-11 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-11 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-10 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-10 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-10 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-04 | to Jud | |
2011-02-04 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-03 | to printing | |
2011-02-03 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-03 | Senate intro |