ID S1063 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Session Law Chapter 322 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Session Law Chapter 322 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SECRETARY OF STATE -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the storage of records belonging to the Secretary of State.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the storage of records belonging to the Secretary of State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 322 Effective: 07/01/2021 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2021-05-05 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2021-05-05 | House | to Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Title apvd |
2021-05-05 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2021-05-05 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-02-23 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2021-02-23 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2021-02-22 | Senate | to House |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |