ID S1062 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 72 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 72 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to motor vehicle registration and dealers and salesmen licensing to provide that laden dealer or manufacturer plates shall be available to licensed dealers and manufacturers operating vehicles with laden loads, to provide that such plates shall be exempt from certain provisions, to provide that the operating fee for a laden dealer or manufacturer plate will be equal to the fees for certain commercial vehicles, to provide for a maximum gross vehicle weight and to provide for temporary weight increase permits; to provide that certain provisions shall not apply to laden dealer or manufacturer plates; and to provide for limitation of use.
Title
Amends existing law relating to motor vehicle registration and dealers and salesmen licensing to provide that laden dealer or manufacturer plates shall be available to licensed dealers and manufacturers operating vehicles with laden loads, to provide that such plates shall be exempt from certain provisions, to provide that the operating fee for a laden dealer or manufacturer plate will be equal to the fees for certain commercial vehicles, to provide for a maximum gross vehicle weight and to provide for temporary weight increase permits; to provide that certain provisions shall not apply to laden dealer or manufacturer plates; and to provide for limitation of use.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 72 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-03-11 | Delivered to Governor on 03/10 | |
2011-03-10 | To Governor | |
2011-03-09 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-08 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-08 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-07 | To enrol | |
2011-03-04 | to Senate | |
2011-03-04 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-04 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 67-0-3 | |
2011-02-28 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-28 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-25 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-25 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-25 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-18 | to Transp | |
2011-02-18 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-18 | House intro | |
2011-02-17 | to House | |
2011-02-17 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-17 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-2 | |
2011-02-15 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-15 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-14 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-14 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-14 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-01 | to Transp | |
2011-02-01 | Rpt prt | |
2011-01-31 | to printing | |
2011-01-31 | 1st rdg | |
2011-01-31 | Senate intro |