ID S1060 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - U.C. to be placed on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION -- Adds to existing law to provide flexible schedules and early graduation opportunities for college and career ready students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide flexible schedules and early graduation opportunities for college and career ready students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseU.C. to be placed on General Orders
2019-03-15HouseReported out without amendments; filed for second reading
2019-03-11HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2019-02-28HouseRead First Time, Referred to Education
2019-02-28HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-27Senateto House
2019-02-27SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-27SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 34-0-1
2019-02-25SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2019-02-22SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2019-02-22SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2019-02-22SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-02-21SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2019-02-21SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2019-02-21SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-02-15SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2019-02-08SenateReported Printed; referred to Education
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback