ID S1059 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 92 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 92 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MASTER TEACHER PREMIUMS -- Amends existing law to extend eligibility for master teacher premiums to pupil service staff employees under certain conditions.
Title
Amends existing law to extend eligibility for master teacher premiums to pupil service staff employees under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 92 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-03-15 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-03-13 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-13 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-13 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 59-11-0 |
2017-03-10 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-09 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-28 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2017-02-28 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-02-27 | Senate | to House |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-1-1 -Engelking |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |